21/09/1947 |
Kingham Dump |
On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. |
SLS/194710 |
04/07/1964 |
Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. |
SLS/196408 |
11/12/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. |
SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 |
Crewe Works (Side of Works) |
Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. |
SLS/196702 |
19/02/1967 |
Crewe Works (Old paint shop area) |
Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. |
SLS/196704 |