|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7336 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25204 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77336 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3009 | ||
20/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63009 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90009 | ||
15/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
01/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90009 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |