Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 478 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 34190 Month
» 68832 Year
» 1290397 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7339 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77339 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3010 m/e 04/1947
BR (1st BR) 63010 w/e 15/05/1948
BR 90010 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25207
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/02/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 30/06/1950
91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
84D Leamington 4w/e 27/03/1954
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 14/07/1956
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/01/1958
18B Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
9G Gorton w/e 30/06/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse 18/03/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 21/05/1950
LOAN 40B Immingham 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley m/e 31/10/1951
LOAN 84D Leamington 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7339
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25207
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77339    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90010    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90010    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev