|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7354 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25224 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77354 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3015 | ||
24/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63015 | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90015 | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
18/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90015 | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |