Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1970 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15376 Week
» 68392 Month
» 187919 Year
» 3214772 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7356 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77356 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90255 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1943 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
22/09/1956 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
16/03/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
26/12/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
17/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/12/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7356 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25232 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77356 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90255 |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
26/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90255 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |
|
|