16/11/1948 |
Brighton Works |
In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. |
SLS/194812 |
06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
10/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. |
SLS/195007 |
30/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks. B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted. |
SLS/195008 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
04/02/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. |
SLS/196203 |