Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 769 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4629 Week
» 7211 Month
» 271844 Year
» 1493409 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7368 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77368 m/e 01/1945
BR 90261 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25239
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/07/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1943
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
84D Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1956
84C Banbury 4w/e 05/09/1959
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 15/07/1962
26B Agecroft w/e 01/06/1963
10F Rose Grove w/e 17/10/1964
10H Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 10/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/10/1947
GWRALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) m/e 30/11/1947
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 10/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Stratton Park The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. SLS/194709
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. SLS/194711
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7368
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25239
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77368    
10/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90261    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
17/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
10/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90261    

prev prev