Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7369 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77369 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3023 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63023 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
British Railways |
90023 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1943 |
31F |
|
Spital Bridge |
w/e |
26/12/1959 |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
29/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
31F |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7369 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25240 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77369 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3023 |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63023 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90023 |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90023 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |
|
|