|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Weigh House) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7370 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25241 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77370 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3024 | ||
25/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63024 | ||
07/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90024 | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
20/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
29/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90024 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |