Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1055 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14461 Week
» 67477 Month
» 187004 Year
» 3213857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7373 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77373 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3025 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63025 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90025 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
11/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
30/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
w/e |
08/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/08/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
Colwich MPD - stored locomotives |
63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). |
SLS/195811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7373 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25244 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77373 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3025 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63025 but not taken up |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90025 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
01/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90025 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|