|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7385 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25257 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77385 | ||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3031 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63031 but not taken up | ||
07/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90031 | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
11/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
18/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90031 | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |