Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7406 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77406 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90282 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1943 |
27B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
27B |
|
Aintree |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/01/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
on |
07/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
2w/e |
12/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7406 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25276 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77406 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90282 |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90282 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|