Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15045 Week
» 68061 Month
» 187588 Year
» 3214441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7410 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77410 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3034 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63034 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90034 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1943 |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
4w/e |
10/05/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7410 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25281 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77410 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3034 |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63034 |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90034 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90034 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |
|
|