Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2259 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15665 Week
» 68681 Month
» 188208 Year
» 3215061 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7412 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77412 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3035 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63035 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
British Railways |
90035 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1943 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
w/e |
11/09/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Works Yard) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7412 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25283 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77412 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3035 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63035 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90035 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
27/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90035 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|