Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 8 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17811 Week
» 70827 Month
» 190354 Year
» 3217207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7419 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77419 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90291 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/05/1947 |
St Margarets MPD |
An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7419 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25289 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77419 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90291 |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90291 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|