Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7421 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77421 m/e 01/1945
BR 90292 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25291
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26B Agecroft m/e 16/06/1956
9G Gorton w/e 01/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
   Withdrawn 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC LA Laira m/e 31/08/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield 23/09/1949
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7421
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25291
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77421    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90292    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90292    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev