Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2964 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16370 Week
» 69386 Month
» 188913 Year
» 3215766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7427 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77427 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3039 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63039 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90039 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7427 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25155 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77427 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3039 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63039 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90039 |
|
|
13/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
02/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
02/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90039 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|