Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7430 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77430 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3040 |
on |
06/04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63040 |
on |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90040 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7430 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25157 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77430 |
|
|
06/04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3040 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63040 but not taken up |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90040 |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90040 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|