|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
07/03/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) | Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. | SLS/196504 |
04/04/1965 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. | SLS/196505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7437 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25295 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77437 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3042 | ||
09/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63042 | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90042 | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90042 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |