|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7442 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25300 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77442 | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90306 | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) | ||
28/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) | ||
07/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (8L) | ||
08/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
27/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90306 | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |