Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1175 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14581 Week
» 67597 Month
» 187124 Year
» 3213977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7444 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77444 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90308 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1947 |
Brighton Works |
New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7444 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25302 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77444 |
|
|
25/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90308 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G) |
|
|
12/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90308 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|