Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 882 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2997 Week
» 25503 Month
» 328693 Year
» 1550258 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7452 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77452 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90596 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2291
Works Number 4968
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Tue 04/04/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1943
36C Frodingham 4w/e 25/07/1953
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/04/1957
66A Polmadie 4w/e 10/05/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 07/09/1963
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 30/04/1966
   Withdrawn on 04/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 17/10/1947
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   on 04/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7452
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4968
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77452    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90596    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
04/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90596    

prev prev