Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7460 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77460 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90604 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
4976 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
20 yrs , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
26/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1947 |
Brighton Works |
On 12/8 New 'West Country' 21C166 was outside Brighton Works in works grey, but with the customary green tender. WD 77460 was outside the works freshly repaired and repainted, and 77122 was in Brighton Upper Goods awaiting works. |
SLS/194709 |
26/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
The following WD 2-8-0's were release from repair at Brighton Works for service from Feltham (FEL) depot: 77030, 77074 an 77460. |
SLS/194711 |
20/03/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. |
SLS/195004 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7460 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4976 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77460 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90604 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90604 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|