Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2678 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16084 Week
» 69100 Month
» 188627 Year
» 3215480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7464 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77464 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90608 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
4980 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
23/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
14/07/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Waiting Works) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7464 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4980 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77464 |
|
|
23/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to March (MAR) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90608 |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90608 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|