Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 790 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18593 Week
» 71609 Month
» 191136 Year
» 3217989 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7467 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77467 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90611 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
4983 |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/08/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
ANN |
Annesley |
on |
24/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
on |
05/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
55D |
Royston |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7467 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4983 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77467 |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90611 |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
26/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
17/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90611 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|