|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | W.D. \"8F\" | Some of the W.D. '8F' class previously on loan to the Southern Region have gone to the L.M.R., including 90332, 90347, 90527, 90619, an 90655 to Huddersfield (25B). | SLS/195008 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) | Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. | SLS/195206 |
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Works Sidings) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7481 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4997 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77481 | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) | ||
11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90619 | ||
09/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
25/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90619 | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |