|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7482 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4998 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77482 | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90620 | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
08/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90620 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |