Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7491 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77491 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3116 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63116 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90437 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5007 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 17/04/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1944 |
ANN |
|
Annesley |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
01/01/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/04/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
3w/e |
01/01/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/04/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7491 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5007 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77491 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3116 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63116 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90437 |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90437 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|