Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7493 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77493 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3117 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63117 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90438 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5009 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 03/10/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7493 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5009 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77493 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3117 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63117 but not taken up |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90438 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
27/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90438 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|