Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4859 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18902 Week
» 83856 Month
» 286520 Year
» 3313373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7494 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77494 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90626 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5010 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/03/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/05/1947 |
St Margarets MPD |
An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7494 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5010 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77494 |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90626 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90626 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|