Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3540 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16946 Week
» 69962 Month
» 189489 Year
» 3216342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7502 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
77502 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3121 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63121 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90442 |
w/e |
02/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5018 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 04/04/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7502 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5018 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77502 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3121 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63121 but not taken up |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90442 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
04/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90442 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|