Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4274 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17680 Week
» 70696 Month
» 190223 Year
» 3217076 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7503 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
77503 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90629 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5019 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 26/09/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1944 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
26/09/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
YK |
York (North) |
on |
08/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
on |
12/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/09/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7503 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5019 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77503 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90629 |
|
|
26/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90629 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|