Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 855 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18658 Week
» 71674 Month
» 191201 Year
» 3218054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7504 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
77504 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3122 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63122 |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90443 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5020 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 27/06/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
23/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
33A |
Plaistow |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7504 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5020 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77504 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3122 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63122 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90443 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
27/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90443 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|