Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 775 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 33307 Month
» 67949 Year
» 1289514 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7508 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 77508 m/e 01/1945
BR 90630 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5024
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WES Westbury 4w/e 03/12/1949
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 30/04/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 6w/e 30/06/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/08/1951
81C Southall m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/11/1946
LOAN WES Westbury m/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7508
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5024
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77508    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90630    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (WES)    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90630    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev