Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 451 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1836 Week
» 8641 Month
» 115587 Year
» 1337152 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9780 m/e 06/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1936
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 29 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1961
88H Tondu 4w/e 09/02/1963
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 25/01/1964
87A Neath (Court Sart) 7w/e 22/06/1964
88B Radyr 2w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 88B Radyr 2w/e 24/01/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 9780
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9780    

prev prev