|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. | SLS/194709 |
10/10/1965 | Doncaster Shed (Stored) | Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. | SLS/196511 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/09/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8512 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24949 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78512 | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90364 | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
21/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
26/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
16/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
05/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90364 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |