Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 86 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21120 Week
» 119765 Month
» 322429 Year
» 3349282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78522 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90367 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L943 |
Works Number |
25419 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 27/02/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Received ex Crewe LMS after repairs, 19/4/1947. Engine History sheet has built date as 27/1/1945. |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78522 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25419 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90367 |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
27/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90367 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|