Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18001 Week
» 71017 Month
» 190544 Year
» 3217397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78525 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90368 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton MPD |
On Shed ex-Works : 63704/64, 90293/305/68. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78525 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25422 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90368 |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90368 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|