Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78538 |
m/e |
02/1945 |
British Railways |
90411 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78538 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25393 |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90411 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
18/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90411 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|