Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 74 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4034 Week
» 33620 Month
» 407633 Year
» 1629198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78551 m/e 03/1945
British Railways 90417 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25406
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1945
52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/04/1947 Stonor Dump 70200 was still at Stonor 'dump' on 29/4 and on the same day 77092, 78541 and 78551 were on Dover shed. SLS/194706
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709
09/09/1967 Sunderland On the last day of steam working, Saturday, 9th September, 63395 worked to South Hetton and Dunston, 65894 to Vane Tempest Colliery and Dunston, 90348 to Dunston and Hylton Colliery and 90417 to South Hetton and Tyne Yard. 65894 had worked the last steam trips on the Silksworth branch on Friday, 8th September. (D2071/4 were booked for the Silksworth branch week commencing 11th September.) SLS/196710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78551
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25406
   
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90417    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90417    

prev prev