Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1068 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18871 Week
» 71887 Month
» 191414 Year
» 3218267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78565 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3088 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63088 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90088 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78565 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25326 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3088 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63088 but not taken up |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90088 |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
25/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90088 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|