Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3946 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17352 Week
» 70368 Month
» 189895 Year
» 3216748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78582 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3093 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63093 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
British Railways |
90093 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1944 |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
4w/e |
10/05/1958 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
27/06/1959 |
33A |
|
Plaistow |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
33A |
Plaistow |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78582 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3093 |
|
|
17/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63093 |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90093 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90093 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |
|
|