Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 255 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2820 Week
» 1558 Month
» 415879 Year
» 1637444 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78585 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 90382 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25346
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1944
HLD Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
51G Haverton Hill 4w/e 21/10/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/09/1957
52G Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/09/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 51G Haverton Hill w/e 24/09/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
14/12/1954 York MPD Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). SLS/195501
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 78585    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90382    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90382    

prev