Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 325 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4063 Week
» 1576 Month
» 229460 Year
» 1451025 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78601 m/e 12/1944
BR 90394 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25362
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Tue 21/04/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1944
38A Colwick 5w/e 23/07/1955
40B Immingham w/e 16/04/1960
   Withdrawn 21/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN IMM Immingham 23/02/1947
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock 05/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   21/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 78601    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90394    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90394