Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78610 m/e 12/1944
BR 90401 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 25371
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
41D Canklow w/e 22/02/1964
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 03/04/1965
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England 25/02/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 23/03/1947
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 03/04/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 78610    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90401    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
14/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Canklow shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90401    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev