Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3717 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17123 Week
» 70139 Month
» 189666 Year
» 3216519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8627 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
78627 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3127 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63127 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90448 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5028 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/12/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8627 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5028 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78627 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3127 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63127 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90448 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90448 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|