Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR (1st BR) 63128   Not applied
War Dept. 8628 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 78628 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3128 m/e 03/1947
BR 90449 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5029
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 16/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
6B Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 16/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick 25/11/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 12/07/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   02/06/1964
WDN 41J Langwith Junction 02/06/1964
REINS 41J Langwith Junction 13/09/1964
WDN   w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8628
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5029
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78628    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90449    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90449    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev