Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18635 Week
» 71651 Month
» 191178 Year
» 3218031 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8633 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
78633 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3130 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63130 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90451 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5034 |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/12/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1944 |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
50D |
|
Goole |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/12/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
12/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
50D |
Goole |
4w/e |
07/09/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8633 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5034 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78633 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3130 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63130 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90451 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
23/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90451 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|