Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1104 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14510 Week
» 67526 Month
» 187053 Year
» 3213906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8634 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
78634 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3131 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63131 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90452 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5035 |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/06/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8634 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5035 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78634 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3131 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63131 but not taken up |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90452 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
21/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90452 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |
|
|