Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1400 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19203 Week
» 72219 Month
» 191746 Year
» 3218599 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8635 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
78635 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3132 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63132 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90453 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5036 |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 04/10/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
18/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
5w/e |
09/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/10/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8635 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5036 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78635 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3132 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63132 but not taken up |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90453 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
04/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90453 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|